South Broward Hospital District v. Azar
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 0:2019cv62436
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: South Broward Hospital District response due 1/10/2020. (ls)(per DE #11)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by January 10, 2020. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by South Broward Hospital District. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Alex M Azar, II. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Alex M Azar, II(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Service,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#8]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by South Broward Hospital District. Alex M Azar, II served on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #7)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by South Broward Hospital District on the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Florida (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by South Broward Hospital District of Technical Failure of the Court's CM/ECF System (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Florida. (amb) Text Modified on 10/1/2019 (amb).
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Adverse Agency Decision against Alex M Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-12026330, payment transferred from : 19CV62429 South Broward Hospital District v. Alex M. Azar, II, filed by South Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Exhibit A)(Jackson-Fannin, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Broward Hospital District v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District
Represented By: Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?