Fischer v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Fischer
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 0:2019cv62447
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #8 Amended Complaint And Strike Jury Demand filed by Joseph Fischer. Replies due by 12/4/2019. (Sasson, Jamie)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his Response on or before November 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #8 Amended Complaint And Strike Jury Demand by Joseph Fischer. (Sasson, Jamie)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/15/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as a stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/4/2019. (osd)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDERSETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/15/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for all discovery matters.. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #8 Amended Complaint And Strike Jury Demand by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Kahn, Jeremy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter David Ticktin on behalf of Joseph Fischer. Attorney Peter David Ticktin added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla). (Ticktin, Peter)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Joseph Fischer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Scheduling Order)(Sasson, Jamie)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in light of the Court's 9 Order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in light of #8 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Joseph Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sasson, Jamie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Joseph Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion)(Sasson, Jamie)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 24, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kahn, Jeremy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Kahn, Jeremy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12029812, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1 - Complaint, Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Kahn
Represented By: Andrew Benjamin Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jeremy L. Kahn
Represented By: Andrew Benjamin Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?