Roth v. Welt
Appellant: Philip Roth
Appellee: Kenneth A. Welt
Case Number: 0:2019cv62462
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended Order Setting Oral Argument and Briefing Schedule in Bankruptcy Appeal, ( Appellant Brief due by 12/16/2019., Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/29/2020., Appellee Brief due by 1/15/2020., Hearing re Oral Argument set for 3/25/2020 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 12/16/2019. (jc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 9/17/2019 before Judge John K. Olson, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-10 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2020. (smd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 8/22/2019 before Judge John K. Olson, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2020. (smd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Philip Roth (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Designation)(smd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Oral Argument and Briefing Schedule in Bankruptcy Appeal, (Appellant Brief due by 11/14/2019., Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/23/2019., Hearing set for 2/24/2020 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Philip Roth (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-10107-JKO, filed by Philip Roth.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roth v. Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Philip Roth
Represented By: Mark Stuart Roher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kenneth A. Welt
Represented By: Scott Neil Brown
Represented By: Hayley Gerson Harrison
Represented By: Zakarij Neil Laux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?