Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. M/V La Guerca
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: M/V La Guerca, Official No. (BVI) 739575, etc. in rem and M/V La Guerca
Case Number: 0:2019cv62479
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay Joint Scheduling Report Requirement. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay Joint Scheduling Report Requirement by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 12/9/2019 (Cann, Eve)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc., Other Affiliate Baker Donelson, Other Affiliate Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Eve A. Cann, Other Affiliate Spencer D. Leach, Other Affiliate M/V La Guerca, Official No. (BVI) 739575, Other Affiliate True Marine Ventures, Ltd. for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (Cann, Eve)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE (Proof) by Publication by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Last Publication date 11/19/2019. Claims/Positions/Written Defenses/Answers/etc., due by 12/19/2019. (Cann, Eve)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ACTION IN REM AND ARREST OF VESSEL re #11 Oder. (cds)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Issuance of Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel for Publication. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel for Publication by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Notice of Action)(Cann, Eve)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to M/V La Guerca. (cds)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian. National Liquidators, Inc. appointed. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint National Liquidators, Inc. as Custodian Substitute by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cann, Eve)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant In Rem Issued as to M/V La Guerca. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Warrant)(Cann, Eve)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Rem against M/V La Guerca, Official No. (BVI) 739575, etc. in rem. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-113C-12040244, payment transferred from : 0:19-cv-62477-XXXX Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. M/V La Guerca, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cann, Eve) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. M/V La Guerca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V La Guerca, Official No. (BVI) 739575, etc. in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V La Guerca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Eve Alexis Cann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?