GEICO Indemnity Company v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 0:2019cv62514
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (dj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by GEICO Indemnity Company (Schiller, Bruce)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (dj)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by GEICO Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Schiller, Bruce)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12050850, filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiller, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEICO Indemnity Company v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Bruce Howard Schiller
Represented By: Julie Elena Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?