B & I Contractors, Inc. v. BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: B&I Contractors, Inc., United States of America and B & I Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC and AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 0:2019cv62550
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:0270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of filing Proposed Agreed Order by B & I Contractors, Inc., United States of America re #9 MOTION to Stay Arbitration and/or Abate (Kayusa, Michael) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (lk).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit a Joint Scheduling Report on or before December 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/9/2019. (kou)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time Submit Joint Scheduling Report re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by B & I Contractors, Inc., United States of America. Attorney Michael Francis Kayusa added to party United States of America(pty:pla). Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Kayusa, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Stay and Joinder in Motion to Arbitrate and or Abate Action by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC. Responses due by 12/19/2019 (Hingston, Robert)
November 21, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 16 : All Defendants. (lk)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants, BES and AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY,shall file an Answer/Response to the Complaint on or before December 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/21/2019. (kou)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time 20 day extension re #1 Complaint by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2019 (Hingston, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allen Hingston on behalf of AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC. Attorney Robert Allen Hingston added to party AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Allen Hingston added to party BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC(pty:dft). (Hingston, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Aegis Security signed by: Sandra Quinones re #11 Summons Issued by B & I Contractors, Inc. (Kayusa, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of BES Design signed by: Sandra Quinones re #8 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by B & I Contractors, Inc. (Kayusa, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(lk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kayusa, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Arbitration and/or Abate by B & I Contractors, Inc.. Responses due by 10/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kayusa, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) BES Design by B & I Contractors, Inc. (Kayusa, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Aegis by B & I Contractors, Inc. (Kayusa, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by B & I Contractors, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Kayusa, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ar2)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ar2)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&I Contractors, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12061372, filed by B&I Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kayusa, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B & I Contractors, Inc. v. BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BES DESIGN/BUILD, LLC
Represented By: Robert Allen Hingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Allen Hingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&I Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Francis Kayusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Francis Kayusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & I Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Francis Kayusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?