Moncada v. Bailey 44, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Moncada
Defendant: Bailey 44, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62579
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RESETTING PLANNING & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference re-set for 1/10/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR BRIEF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until December 16, 2019 to either file his motion for default judgment and proposed order or file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment or Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Daniel Moncada. Responses due by 12/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hannah, Roderick)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment or Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until December 6, 2019 to either file his motion for default judgment and proposed order or file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment or Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice re #9 Order by Daniel Moncada. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hannah, Roderick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Mae Rabinowitz on behalf of Bailey 44, LLC. Attorney Veronica Mae Rabinowitz added to party Bailey 44, LLC(pty:dft). (Rabinowitz, Veronica)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Entry of Default as to Bailey 44, LLC - Motions Terminated: #7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/12/2019. (cqs)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Bailey 44, LLC by Daniel Moncada. (Hannah, Roderick)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 12/2/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Daniel Moncada. Bailey 44, LLC served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Duran, Pelayo)
October 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON STATE LAW CLAIMS. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Count Two of Plaintiffs Complaint (D.E. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bailey 44, LLC. (cds)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bailey 44, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12071466, filed by Daniel Moncada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s))(Duran, Pelayo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncada v. Bailey 44, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey 44, LLC
Represented By: Veronica Mae Rabinowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Moncada
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?