Cournoyer v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Cournoyer
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv62594
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STAYING CASE. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company of Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Little, Jason)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Plaintiffs Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response and/or Agreed Order to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Abate. The Plaintiff shall submit a response or an agreed-upon order on or before Friday, November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/20/19. (rwr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Daniel Cournoyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Stabinski, Todd)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Plaintiffs Second Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response and/or Agreed Order to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Abate. The Plaintiff may resubmit the request for an extension of time after Defendants counsel has conferred with Defendant. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/19/19.(rwr)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Daniel Cournoyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stabinski, Todd)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Leidy Cuervo, Todd J. Stabinski, Jason Gregory Little, (Digital 14:01:37-14:12:38) (at)
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company re #5 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Certification of Pre-Conference Conferral (Little, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Abate. The Plaintiff shall submit his response on or before Monday, November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/7/19. (rwr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Daniel Cournoyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stabinski, Todd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Little, Jason)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 6/18/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Leidy Cuervo, mailing date October 21, 2019, (pt)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12075538, filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Comp B, #4 Exhibit C)(Little, Jason) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cournoyer v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cournoyer
Represented By: Todd J. Stabinski
Represented By: Leidy Cuervo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Gregory Little
Represented By: Paige Boiko Segrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?