McNeal v. Palma et al
Plaintiff: Angela M. McNeal
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC and Jorge L. Palma
Case Number: 0:2019cv62595
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Jorge L. Palma (McHale, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Jorge L. Palma (McHale, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Angela M. McNeal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Donald)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Angela M. McNeal (Yarbrough, Donald)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Angela M. McNeal (Yarbrough, Donald)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Jorge L. Palma. (McHale, Charles)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/2/2019) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendants shall respond to/answer the Complaint no later than November 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/14/2019. (lbn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Jorge L. Palma. Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party LVNV Funding, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party Jorge L. Palma(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McHale, Charles)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Angela M. McNeal. LVNV Funding, LLC served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Yarbrough, Donald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Angela M. McNeal. Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Yarbrough, Donald)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Jorge L. Palma. (pes)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Angela M. McNeal re #1 Complaint, filed by Angela M. McNeal (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s)) (Yarbrough, Donald)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (cds)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Jorge L. Palma. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12076161, filed by Angela M. McNeal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s))(Yarbrough, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Palma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. McNeal
Represented By: Donald A. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Charles James McHale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreu, Palma, Lavin & Solis, PLLC
Represented By: Charles James McHale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge L. Palma
Represented By: Charles James McHale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?