United States of America v. 1984 Cessna 550 Citation II Jet Aircraft with Serial No. S550-0020 and Registration No. YV3325
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: 1984 CESSNA 550 CITATION II JET AIRCRAFT WITH SERIAL NO. S550-0020 AND REGISTRATION NO. YV3325
Case Number: 0:2019cv62616
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #4 Warrant In Rem Issued, #1 Complaint for Forfeiture, Warrant of Arrest in Rem Return Executed/Process Receipt and Return filed by United States of America. (Rosen, Adrienne)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant In Rem Issued as to 1984 Cessna 550 Citation II Jet Aircraft with Serial No. S550-0020 and Registration No. YV3325. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
October 21, 2019 Case Reopened. Case closed in error (asl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Entry Text Modified- Case closed in error (amb) Modified on 10/22/2019 (asl).
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture [Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem] against 1984 CESSNA 550 CITATION II JET AIRCRAFT WITH SERIAL NO. S550-0020 AND REGISTRATION NO. YV3325. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Complaint Cover Sheet, #3 Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Warrant Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Rosen, Adrienne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 1984 Cessna 550 Citation II Jet Aircraft with Serial No. S550-0020 and Registration No. YV3325
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1984 CESSNA 550 CITATION II JET AIRCRAFT WITH SERIAL NO. S550-0020 AND REGISTRATION NO. YV3325
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Adrienne Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?