UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Kronowitz
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Kenneth G. Kronowitz
Case Number: 0:2019cv62648
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 5316
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2020., Discovery due by 9/22/2020., Expert Discovery due by 9/22/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 2/17/2020., Mediation Deadline 10/6/2020., In Limine Motions due by 10/14/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2020., Motions due by 10/14/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/4/2021., Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 1/12/2021 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Kenneth G. Kronowitz. (Lapekas, Karen)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Disclosure(s) of Interested Persons by Kenneth G. Kronowitz (Lapekas, Karen)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Magistrate Judge Election)(Desmond, Conor)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA identifying Other Affiliate Internal Revenue Service for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Desmond, Conor)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Kenneth G. Kronowitz waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Desmond, Conor)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth G. Kronowitz. (pcs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth G. Kronowitz. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons)(Desmond, Conor) Modified to correct who the complaint is against on 10/24/2019 (jua).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Kronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth G. Kronowitz
Represented By: Karen J Lapekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Conor Patrick Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?