J.P. Morgan Securities LLC v. Barroso
Plaintiff: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Defendant: Justin Barroso
Case Number: 0:2019cv62736
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Buckstein, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #27 Joint Stipulation regarding Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery and Motion to Cancel November 18, 2019 Hearing. Staying Case; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 11/18/19 before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt, pursuant to the Parties' #27 stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2019. (hhr)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION Regarding Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Expedited Discovery and Motion to Cancel November 18, 2019 Hearing by Justin Barroso (Petrescu, Victor)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Justin Barroso re #21 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency,, Order on Motion to Continue, of Submitting Joint Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Petrescu, Victor)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Steven Castaldo. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
November 6, 2019 Attorney Steven Castaldo representing J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Plaintiff) Activated. (pt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Buckstein, Brian)
November 5, 2019 Filing 23 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Castaldo. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buckstein, Brian)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting hearing. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Fort Lauderdale division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/5/2019. (hhr)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency; denying #14 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2019 re #14 MOTION to Continue re 13 Order Setting Hearing on Motion filed by Justin Barroso, #6 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Victor Petrescu, Brian D. Buckstein, (Digital 14:06:40) (tw)
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Justin Barroso. (ls)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Vacating #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney Steven Castaldo terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Steven Castaldo. Denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Defendant's Counsel Compliant Motion due 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #14 Motion to Continue Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 at 2 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/5/2019. (hhr)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Steven Castaldo. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue re 13 Order Setting Hearing on Motion by Justin Barroso. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Petrescu, Victor)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #6 Emergency Motion. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/4/2019. (hhr)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING #6 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (mno)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Castaldo. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12120313 by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law in support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Affidaivt of Ian Beller filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor Petrescu on behalf of Justin Barroso. Attorney Victor Petrescu added to party Justin Barroso(pty:dft). (Petrescu, Victor)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC of filing corrected Summons for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Buckstein, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - the image is BLANK. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Barroso. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12118881, filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s))(Buckstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC v. Barroso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Barroso
Represented By: Victor Petrescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Buckstein
Represented By: Steven Castaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?