Newman v. Credit Control, LLC
Plaintiff: Paul J Newman
Defendant: Credit Control, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62820
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES, Credit Control, LLC response due 12/12/2019, Motion for Entry of Clerks Default due 12/19/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Paul J Newman. Credit Control, LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Anderson, Shera)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of interested parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit Control, LLC. (ail)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit Control, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12140327, filed by Paul J Newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Anderson, Shera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Credit Control, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J Newman
Represented By: Shera Erskine Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?