Cancino v. Mastro's FTL, LLC,
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Cancino
Defendant: Mastro's FTL, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62822
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's REPLY to #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Mastro's FTL, LLC. (Harvey, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Case and Discovery and Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Juan Carlos Cancino. Replies due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Juan Carlos Cancino in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration)(Genadiev, Simeon)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Case and Discovery and Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support by Mastro's FTL, LLC. Attorney David Sydney Harvey, Jr added to party Mastro's FTL, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Harvey, David)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mastro's FTL, LLC. (ail)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mastro's FTL, LLC, d/b/a Mastro's Ocean Club. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12141127, filed by Juan Carlos Cancino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Genadiev, Simeon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cancino v. Mastro's FTL, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Cancino
Represented By: Simeon Genadiev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastro's FTL, LLC
Represented By: David Sydney Harvey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?