D'Amico v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Steven D'Amico
Respondent: Florida Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 0:2019cv62840
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (bb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-01310. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/13/2019. (CAW)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Steven D'Amico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit f, #7 Exhibit g, #8 Exhibit h, #9 Exhibit i, #10 Exhibit j, #11 Exhibit k)(no filing fees paid, no IFP, no service copies, post mark dated 11/5/2019)(TSW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amico v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?