Tuckman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Brad Tuckman
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and John Torres
Case Number: 0:2019cv62843
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Mark W. Kinghorn. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/10/2020. (eca)
January 9, 2020 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark W. Kinghorn. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12293225 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 1/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottmann, Emily)
January 9, 2020 Filing 37 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Its Dispositive Motion to Dismiss and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 1/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's First Request For Production, #3 Exhibit C - California Order Granting Arbitration)(Difato, Brittney)
January 9, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Seal and Substitute Redacted Exhibit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Funding Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Difato, Brittney)
January 9, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, Alternatively, to Stay the Case and Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 1/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wells Affirmative Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Funding Agreement)(Difato, Brittney)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle added. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Jose E. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/8/2020. (mws)
January 7, 2020 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by John Torres. (Klein, Jonathan)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Jason D. Linder. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Glenn K. Vanzura. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 Initial Disclosure(s) of Defendant Initial Disclosures Defendant Chase Bank, N.A.'s Initial Disclosures by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Homer, Peter)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Brad Tuckman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction - Final Disposition of Motions)(Schachter, Adam)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/18/2019. (mws)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Attend Case Management Conference Telephonically. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/18/2019. (mws)
December 16, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brad Tuckman identifying Other Affiliate Bird Film Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Creative Drive LLC, Other Affiliate Kreate Films, LLC, Other Affiliate Shona Tuckman, Other Affiliate Xendoo, Inc. for Brad Tuckman (Schachter, Adam)
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Difato, Brittney)
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Torres (Klein, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Permit Attendance at Case Management Conference by Telephone re #13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by John Torres. (Klein, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by John Torres. (Klein, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason D. Linder. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12219627 by John Torres. Responses due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Glenn K. Vanzura. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12219512 by John Torres. Attorney Jonathan Samuel Klein added to party John Torres(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jonathan)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 12/10/2019. (jz)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/9/2019. (mws)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Permit Attendance at Case Management Conference by Telephone re #13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rottmann, Emily)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 8/14/2020), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Brad Tuckman. John Torres served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Schachter, Adam)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/27/2019. (mws)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Difato, Brittney)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brittney Lauren Difato on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Attorney Brittney Lauren Difato added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Difato, Brittney)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Rottmann, Emily)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara F. Holladay-Tobias on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Attorney Sara F. Holladay-Tobias added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RECUSING JUDGE AND REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Kathleen M. Williams recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Brad Tuckman. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Schachter, Adam)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brad Tuckman. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Schachter, Adam)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., John Torres, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (jao)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12151529, filed by Brad Tuckman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) WFB, #3 Summon(s) JPM, #4 Summon(s) Torres)(Schachter, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuckman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Tuckman
Represented By: Adam Michael Schachter
Represented By: Freddy Funes
Represented By: Christian Giacomo Montelione
Represented By: Brian W. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sara F. Holladay-Tobias
Represented By: Brittney Lauren Difato
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Mark W. Kinghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Torres
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Klein
Represented By: Glenn K. Vanzura
Represented By: Jason D. Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?