Teo v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Alfred S Teo, Sr. and Alfred S.K. Teo, Sr.
Defendant: Esq. William P. Barr, Esq. Ashley Moody, Regina Lombardo, Attorney General of the State of Florida, Acting Deputy Director of the United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 0:2019cv63042
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Alfred S.K. Teo, Sr of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stoll, Amy)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Acting Deputy Director of the United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Attorney General of the State of Florida, Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against William P. Barr, Regina Lombardo, Ashley Moody. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12215203, filed by Alfred S Teo, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Stoll, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teo v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred S Teo, Sr.
Represented By: Amy E. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred S.K. Teo, Sr.
Represented By: Amy E. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Ashley Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Deputy Director of the United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?