Securities and Exchange Commission v. King, Jr.
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Sylvester King, Jr.
Case Number: 0:2019mc61441
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT ENFORCING ORDER OF THE SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION AGAINST SYLVESTER KING, JR. ORDER granting #6 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roessner, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 PETITION (Complaint) to Enforce Compliance with Final Commission Orders RE: Government Agency. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2019. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of ORDER and Moving Papers (Roessner, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (amb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) to Enforce Compliance with Final Commission Orders RE: Government Agency . Filing fee $ 47.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Roessner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael J. Roessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?