BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. Apotex Corp.
Plaintiff: BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. and BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. a New York Corporation doing business as ALLEGIANT HEALTH
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 0:2020cv60001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/27/2020. (mws)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff BLI International, Inc. d/b/a Allegiant Health's Claims with Prejudice by BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Schoeppl, Carl)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 Apotex Corp.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Apotex Corp.. Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party Apotex Corp.(pty:dft). (Bos, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/27/2020. (mws)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Apotex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Berlowe, Peter)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Emerson Berlowe on behalf of Apotex Corp.. Attorney Peter Emerson Berlowe added to party Apotex Corp.(pty:dft). (Berlowe, Peter)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Harry Gutfleish. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Harry Gutfleish. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12272210 by BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Responses due by 1/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoeppl, Carl)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Harry M. Gutfleish, mailing date January 2, 2020, (pt)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apotex Corp.. (amb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apotex Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12269386, filed by BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A ALLEGIANT HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Notices of Recall, #3 Exhibit Allegiant Recall Program, #4 Exhibit Invoices, #5 Exhibit Loomar Email, #6 Exhibit Bermudez Email, #7 Exhibit Email, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summon(s))(Gray, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Carl Francis Schoeppl, Jr.
Represented By: Terry Arthur Carlin Gray
Represented By: Harry M. Gutfleish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLI INTERNATIONAL, INC. a New York Corporation doing business as ALLEGIANT HEALTH
Represented By: Carl Francis Schoeppl, Jr.
Represented By: Terry Arthur Carlin Gray
Represented By: Harry M. Gutfleish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Andrea Leslie Bos
Represented By: Peter Emerson Berlowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?