USA v. Two Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five (2,135) Kilograms of Kratom
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Two Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five (2,135) Kilograms of Kratom
Case Number: 0:2020cv60024
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA re #6 Order (Attachments: #1 7-1)(Brown, Richard)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Warrant In Rem Issued. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA (Brown, Richard)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Warrant In Rem Issued as to Two Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five (2,135) Kilograms of Kratom. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against Two Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five (2,135) Kilograms of Kratom. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS44, #3 Warrant)(Brown, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Two Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five (2,135) Kilograms of Kratom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard O.I. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five (2,135) Kilograms of Kratom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?