Khan et al v. Panjwani
Appellant: Huma Aamir and Aamir Khan
Appellee: Ali Panjwani
Case Number: 0:2020cv60032
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 12/18/2019 before Judge Scott M Grossman, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-23 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (smd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 10/22/2019 before Judge Scott M Grossman, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (smd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/19/2019 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-9 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (smd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Aamir Khan, Huma Aamir (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet 18-23908, #2 Docket Sheet 19-1040, #3 Designation - List of Items and Statement of Issues, #4 Designation 18-23908 ECF #98, #5 Designation 18-23908 ECF #100.1, #6 Designation 18-23908 ECF #100.2, #7 Designation 18-23908 ECF #101-113, #8 Designation 19-1040)(smd)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Urgent Motion to Maintain Automatic Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION Urgent Motion to Maintain Automatic Stay Pending Appeal and Memorandum of Law filed by Ali Panjwani. Replies due by 3/3/2020. (Aresty, Joel)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 Urgent MOTION to Maintain Automatic Stay Pending Appeal by Huma Aamir, Aamir Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perez, Emmanuel) Modified on 2/25/2020 (kpe).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:20-cv-60032-BB. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Case Number 20-cv-60034-BLOOM. All future filings shall be made in Case Number 20-cv-60032-BLOOM. The parties are also required to comply with all deadlines established by this Court in Case Number 20-cv-60032-BLOOM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-60032-BB, 0:20-cv-60034-BB (kpe) M
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Huma Aamir, Aamir Khan. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Perez, Emmanuel)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order for Briefing. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Maurice Aresty on behalf of Ali Panjwani (Aresty, Joel)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Aamir Khan, Huma Aamir (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-23908-SMG, filed by Aamir Khan, Huma Aamir.(smd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/7/2020) (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan et al v. Panjwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Huma Aamir
Represented By: Samir Masri
Represented By: Emmanuel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aamir Khan
Represented By: Samir Masri
Represented By: Emmanuel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ali Panjwani
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?