King v. Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph King
Defendant: Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc. and Matthew Haiman
Case Number: 0:2020cv60064
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Alicia O Valle
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters And Order of of Court Practice in FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph King. Matthew Haiman waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Levy, Chad)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph King. Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Levy, Chad)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc. (drz)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Matthew Haiman. (drz)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Haiman, Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12297498, filed by Joseph King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Levy, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Fire Alarms & Integration System, Installation Division, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Haiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph King
Represented By: Chad Evan Levy
Represented By: David Mitchell Cozad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?