Lingeswaran v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Karooshan Lingeswaran
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General and Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 0:2020cv60162
Filed: January 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave. Petitioner may file a reply brief to the Court's Order to Show Cause #5 by March 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/23/2020. (btr)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief by Karooshan Lingeswaran. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 10 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney General. (O'Byrne, Hayden)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum of Law In Support of Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Karooshan Lingeswaran re 10 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support of Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11th Cir. Dockets, #2 Exhibit B - Solicitor Gen. Letter, #3 Exhibit C - ISAP Memos) (Prada, Mark) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (kpe).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave. Petitioner shall separately re-file the Memorandum of Law attached to the Motion [9-1] in support of his Petition #1 . Respondents shall file a response and show cause why the Petition should not be granted by March 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz on 2/11/2020. (btr)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law by Karooshan Lingeswaran. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 7 Acknowledgment of Service. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Attorney filed by Karooshan Lingeswaran. (kpe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Karooshan Lingeswaran. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 2/3/2020, answer due 4/3/2020; U.S. Attorney General served on 2/3/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Prada, Mark)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hayden Patrick O'Byrne on behalf of Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney General. Attorney Hayden Patrick O'Byrne added to party Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Patrick O'Byrne added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft). (O'Byrne, Hayden)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
January 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. (kpe)
January 26, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12340498, filed by Karooshan Lingeswaran. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lingeswaran v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karooshan Lingeswaran
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?