OJ Commerce LLC v. Beazley USA Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: OJ Commerce LLC
Defendant: Beazley USA Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv60214
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss #13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, for failure to state a claim and lack of subject matter jurisidiction by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles)
March 26, 2020 Filing 23 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Jeffrey Grubman as Mediator. (Hecht, Shlomo)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On March 11, 2020, the Court issued an Order [DE 15] directing the parties to agree upon a mediator within fourteen (14) days and to advise the Clerks office of their choice. From the record, it appears that the parties have not yet selected a mediator. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by April 2, 2020, showing cause why the Clerk should not be directed to randomly select a mediator from the list of certified mediators. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the Clerk selecting a mediator at random. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/26/2020. (mkz)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Matthew W. Beato ; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gary P. Seligman ; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Bryce L. Friedman. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/25/2020. (mkz)
March 19, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss #13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, for failure to state a claim and lack of subject matter jurisidiction by OJ Commerce LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2020 (Hecht, Shlomo)
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bryce L. Friedman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12615563 by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gary P. Seligman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12615517 by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew W. Beato. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12615456 by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 3/13/2020. (jz)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 2/26/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Laurana Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by OJ Commerce LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hecht, Shlomo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against OJ Commerce LLC by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lemley, Charles)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Lemley, Charles)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Dismissing Counts I and II re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by OJ Commerce LLC Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Count I and Count II without prejudice by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Answer due 2/25/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Answer due 2/18/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Bryce L. Friedman, Gary P. Seligman, Matthew W. Beato, mailing date January 31, 2020, (pt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beazley USA Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Beazley plc for Beazley USA Services, Inc. (Lemley, Charles)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint - state court) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12381621, filed by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration in support, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 continued, #5 Exhibit 1 continued)(Lemley, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OJ Commerce LLC v. Beazley USA Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley USA Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gary P. Seligman
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Charles Collins Lemley
Represented By: Matthew W. Beato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OJ Commerce LLC
Represented By: Shlomo Y Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?