Bremer v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Harold Marcus Bremer
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv60240
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Speedway LLC (Alter, Lindsay)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Harold Marcus Bremer (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of: Claim by Harold Marcus Bremer re #9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Speedway LLC. Attorney Lindsay Marie Alter added to party Speedway LLC(pty:dft). (Alter, Lindsay)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Harold Marcus Bremer. All Defendants. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND RESPONSE IN FLSA CASE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Speedway LLC. (lk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Harold Marcus Bremer re #1 Complaint filed by Harold Marcus Bremer (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number AFLSDC-12398776 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jc)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid. (ar2)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (ar2)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Harold Marcus Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bremer v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Marcus Bremer
Represented By: Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?