Produce Pay, Inc. v. Mama Pacha, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Israel Carrera, Lorena Muro, Agro Exportaciones Wayra S.A.C., Natural Green Produce LLC, Mama Pacha, Inc., Organi-K S.A.C. and Tito Giovanni Bonicelli Proano
Case Number: 0:2020cv60375
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before April 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/14/2020. (mhn)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Default Judgment Pleadings re #16 Order by Produce Pay, Inc.. Responses due by 4/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meuers, Lawrence)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/1/2020. (mhn)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants - Motions Terminated: #14 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/30/2020. (lk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Produce Pay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meuers, Lawrence)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Tito Giovanni Bonicelli Proano served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Organi-K S.A.C. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Agro Exportaciones Wayra S.A.C. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Mama Pacha, Inc. served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Lorena Muro served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Defendants Jose Israel Carrera and Natural Green Produce LLC shall not file a response until all remaining Defendants have been served with process. After all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/26/2020. (mhn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Natural Green Produce LLC served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Produce Pay, Inc.. Jose Israel Carrera served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Produce Pay, Inc. (Meuers, Lawrence)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Agro Exportaciones Wayra S.A.C., Jose Israel Carrera, Mama Pacha, Inc., Lorena Muro, Natural Green Produce LLC, Organi-K S.A.C., Tito Giovanni Bonicelli Proano. (pcs)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12483952, filed by Produce Pay, Inc., a Delaware corporaton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prepayment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - UCC-1, #3 Exhibit 3 - Produce Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Distribution Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Invoices, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoices, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summon(s) -Mama Pacha, Inc., #9 Summon(s) -Lorena Muro, #10 Summon(s) -Tito Giovanni Bonicelli Proano, #11 Summon(s) -Organi-K S.A.C., #12 Summon(s) -Agro Exportaciones Wayra S.A.C., #13 Summon(s) -Natural Green Produce, LLC, #14 Summon(s) -Jose Israel Carrera)(Meuers, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Pay, Inc. v. Mama Pacha, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Israel Carrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Muro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agro Exportaciones Wayra S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Green Produce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mama Pacha, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organi-K S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tito Giovanni Bonicelli Proano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence H. Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?