Molina-Avila et al v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Lee Molina and Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, JacksonvilleField Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 0:2020cv60535
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #4 Plaintiff's EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included , Emergency Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2020. (mmc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila (Prada, Mark)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Striking #9 Renewed EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila (Prada, Mark)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 (STRICKEN PER DE#10) Renewed EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila. Responses due by 3/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email to ICE, #2 Exhibit B - ICE locater results, #3 Exhibit C - staging facility e, #4 Certification of emergency, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)Text Modified on 3/17/2020. (scn)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to Show Cause by Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila, Brenda Lee Molina. (Dominguez, Anthony)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Catala on behalf of Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, JacksonvilleField Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Maria Catala added to party Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Catala added to party Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Catala added to party Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Catala added to party Acting Secretary of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Catala added to party Field Office Director, JacksonvilleField Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Catala, Maria)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Plaintiff's EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included , Emergency Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction --Service on US Attorney's Office; Service on other parties forthcoming filed by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila. (Prada, Mark)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included , Emergency Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Brenda Lee Molina, Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila. Responses due by 3/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Petitioner's Appendix, #2 Certification Certification of Emergency)(Dominguez, Anthony)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, JacksonvilleField Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jao)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (jao)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 , APA Judicial Review, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12591147, filed by Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila, Brenda Lee Molina. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Related Cases, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Dominguez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina-Avila et al v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Maria Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, JacksonvilleField Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Maria Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Maria Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Maria Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Maria Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lee Molina
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Ariel Molina-Avila
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?