Nathanson et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lorraine Nathanson and Andrew Nathanson
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv60632
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/5/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 6/29/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2020., Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020., Fact Discovery due by 12/4/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/3/2020., Mediation Deadline 2/1/2021., In Limine Motions due by 5/28/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2021., Motions due by 5/28/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/1/2021.), Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sigel, Melanie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Andrew Nathanson, Lorraine Nathanson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Scheduling Report)(Hernandez, Daniel)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S #3 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II. USAA Casualty Insurance Company response due 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Hernandez on behalf of Andrew Nathanson, Lorraine Nathanson. Attorney Daniel Hernandez added to party Andrew Nathanson(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Hernandez added to party Lorraine Nathanson(pty:pla). (Hernandez, Daniel)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties, and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties, and Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sigel, Melanie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12654250, filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sigel, Melanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathanson et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Nathanson
Represented By: Kevin Joshua Weisser
Represented By: Daniel Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Kevin Joshua Weisser
Represented By: Daniel Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Melanie D. Sigel
Represented By: Michael Simon
Represented By: Jennifer Virginia Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?