Buck v. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Douglas Buck
Defendant: PTS of America, LLC, Josh Henderson, U.S. Corrections, LLC, Josh Baker, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. f/n/a Prisoner Transportation Services, LLC, Brevard Extraditions, LLC and Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv60724
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (NOTICE OF CONFLICT OF TRIAL) (Behar, Aaron)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 6/15/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2020., Expert Discovery due by 12/23/2020., Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2020., Mediation Deadline 1/15/2021., In Limine Motions due by 3/2/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2021., Motions due by 3/2/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/21/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 PTS OF AMERICA, LLC ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 U.S. CORRECTIONS, LLC ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 PRISONER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 BREVARD EXTRADITIONS, LLC ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (Behar, Aaron)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (Behar, Aaron)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (Behar, Aaron)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT,CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/22/2020 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 22, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Brevard Extraditions, LLC response due 5/26/2020; PTS of America, LLC response due 5/26/2020; Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. response due 5/26/2020; U.S. Corrections, LLC response due 5/26/2020. (lbn)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Damages by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., and U.S. Corrections, LLC. Defendants' response is due no later than May 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/22/2020. (lbn)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Daniel W. Olivas. The Clerk shall permit Daniel W. Olivas to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address dolivas@lewisthomason.com. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/22/2020. (lbn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel W. Olivas, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12780518 by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2020 (Behar, Aaron)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Damages by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2020 (Behar, Aaron)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Behar on behalf of Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Attorney Aaron Behar added to party Brevard Extraditions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Behar added to party PTS of America, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Behar added to party Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Behar added to party U.S. Corrections, LLC(pty:dft). (Behar, Aaron)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Douglas Buck. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Frankel, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Douglas Buck. Brevard Extraditions, LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Frankel, David)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Douglas Buck. U.S. Corrections, LLC served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Frankel, David)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Douglas Buck. PTS of America, LLC served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Frankel, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. (drz)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12716316, filed by Eric Douglas Buck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Frankel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTS of America, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Corrections, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. f/n/a Prisoner Transportation Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brevard Extraditions, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Douglas Buck
Represented By: David Alan Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?