PHH Mortgage Corporation v. Pierre et al
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #4, Unknown Party #1, Jean D. Pierre, Jionel E. Pierre, Unknown Party #3 and United States of America acting through Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 0:2020cv60878
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Plaintiffs counsel shall file an application for pro hac vice admission within seven (7) days from the date of this order. Failure to do so shall result in this action being dismissed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (eyr)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 Motion for Default Judgment. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55 generally provides for the clerk or the Court to enter a default and, subsequently, a default judgment "[w]hen a party against whom a judgment for affirmative relief is sought has failed to plead or otherwise defend." (Emphasis added). Here, Defendant is not seeking any affirmative relief against Plaintiff. Thus, Defendant is not entitled to a default judgment for any of plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/8/2020. (eyr)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to PHH Mortgage Corporation - Motions Terminated: #11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has NOT been filed because PHH Mortgage Corporation is Party Plaintiff. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/8/2020. (pcs) Modified on 6/9/2020 (pcs).
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion for Default Judgment signed by: Jionel E. Pierre re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment by Jionel E. Pierre (pcs)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment by Jionel E. Pierre. (pcs)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default signed by: Jionel E. Pierre re #11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to PHH Mortgage Corporation by Jionel E. Pierre (pcs)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to PHH Mortgage Corporation by Jionel E. Pierre. (pcs)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Dilts, mailing date 05/01/2020. (cco)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall be: double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c).Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/30/2020. (eyr)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/30/2020. (eyr)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/30/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000012959 (jao)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law in support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint for Foreclosure contained within the #2 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Jionel E. Pierre. (jao)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the #2 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Jionel E. Pierre. Responses due by 5/14/2020 (jao)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #3 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. by Jionel E. Pierre. (jao)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Jionel E. Pierre. Responses due by 5/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jao)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Foreclosure) Filing fee $400.00 (PAID), filed by Jionel E. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docs, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(jao)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHH Mortgage Corporation v. Pierre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean D. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jionel E. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America acting through Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?