Ippolito v. Hilex Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Crystal C. Ippolito
Defendant: Hilex Construction Inc and United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv60879
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crystal C. Ippolito. Replies due by 7/1/2020. (Shulby, Todd)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Fox, Alexander)
June 11, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Hilex Construction Inc response due 6/22/2020; United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc. response due 6/22/2020. PER DE#11 (cds)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Vacate #8 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default and Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Alexander)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Fernandez Fox on behalf of Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.. Attorney Alexander Fernandez Fox added to party Hilex Construction Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Fernandez Fox added to party United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.(pty:dft). (Fox, Alexander)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 (VACATED PER DE#11 ) Clerks Entry of Default as to Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc. - Motions Terminated: #7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/2/2020. (cqs) Text Modified on 6/11/2020 (cds).
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc. by Crystal C. Ippolito. (Shulby, Todd)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Crystal C. Ippolito. United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc. served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Shulby, Todd)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Crystal C. Ippolito. Hilex Construction Inc served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Shulby, Todd)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.. (cds)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hilex Construction Inc, United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12821826, filed by Crystal C. Ippolito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Shulby, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ippolito v. Hilex Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal C. Ippolito
Represented By: Todd William Shulby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilex Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Water Restoration Group of South Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?