US Melon LLC v. Bitcorp Inc. et al
Plaintiff: US Melon LLC
Defendant: Bitcorp Inc., Karl Bonhomme and Mario Marquina
Case Number: 0:2020cv61009
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 24 Defendants/Counter-Plaintiff's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendant, Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Karl Bonhomme, Bitcorp Inc., Mario Marquina. (Compres, Tiffany)
July 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Virginia Warner on behalf of Bitcorp Inc., Karl Bonhomme, Mario Marquina. Attorney Susan Virginia Warner added to party Bitcorp Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Virginia Warner added to party Karl Bonhomme(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Virginia Warner added to party Mario Marquina(pty:dft). (Warner, Susan)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants Re: #1 Complaint, filed by US Melon LLC. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than July 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/8/2020. (ogn)
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Bitcorp Inc., Karl Bonhomme, Mario Marquina. (Compres, Tiffany)
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tiffany Natasha Compres (Compres, Tiffany)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline for defendants to respond to Complaint is July 9, 2020 [DE 18]. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/6/2020. (ogn)
July 6, 2020 Reset Deadlines Answer due 7/9/2020as to All Defendants. Per DE#18. (cqs)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by US Melon LLC. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/2/2020. (ogn)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Bitcorp Inc., Karl Bonhomme, Mario Marquina. (Compres, Tiffany)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany Natasha Compres on behalf of Bitcorp Inc., Karl Bonhomme, Mario Marquina. Attorney Tiffany Natasha Compres added to party Bitcorp Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tiffany Natasha Compres added to party Karl Bonhomme(pty:dft), Attorney Tiffany Natasha Compres added to party Mario Marquina(pty:dft). (Compres, Tiffany)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants Re: #1 Complaint, filed by US Melon LLC. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings no later than July 2, 2020. Defendants are also cautioned to comply with their conferral obligations under Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) before filing any future motions. Failure to properly confer will result in the denial of any future motions. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/17/2020. (ogn)
June 17, 2020 Reset Deadlines Bitcorp Inc. answer due 7/2/2020; Karl Bonhomme answerdue 7/2/2020; Mario Marquina answer due 7/2/2020 Per DE#15. (cqs)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to Hire Attorney filed by US Melon LLC. Replies due by 6/23/2020. (Henkel, Timothy)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Request for Extension of Time to Hire Attorney ( Responses due by 6/30/2020) by Karl Bonhomme. (cds)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by US Melon LLC. Karl Bonhomme served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020. (Henkel, Timothy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by US Melon LLC. Bitcorp Inc. served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020. (Henkel, Timothy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bitcorp Inc., Karl Bonhomme. (cqs)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by US Melon LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Bitcorp Inc., #2 Summon(s) Karl Bonhomme) (Henkel, Timothy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - the image is blank. Please "flatten" the PDF and re-file. (cqs)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. It is not necessary to refile this document. Document is a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons (cqs)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by US Melon LLC (Henkel, Timothy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by US Melon LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Bitcorp Inc., #2 Summon(s) Karl Barhomme)(Henkel, Timothy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by US Melon LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Henkel, Timothy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-12920183, payment transferred from : 1:20-cv-22132 US Melon LLC vs. Bitcorp Inc at el, filed by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Invoices, #2 Exhibit B- Marketing Agreement)(Henkel, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Melon LLC v. Bitcorp Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitcorp Inc.
Represented By: Susan Virginia Warner
Represented By: Tiffany Natasha Compres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Bonhomme
Represented By: Susan Virginia Warner
Represented By: Tiffany Natasha Compres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Marquina
Represented By: Susan Virginia Warner
Represented By: Tiffany Natasha Compres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Melon LLC
Represented By: Timothy Dean Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?