JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Cajar et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Alfredo Jose Cajar and Donna L. Cajar
Case Number: 0:2020cv61077
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint scheduling report by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hekkanen, Justin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Hekkanen, Justin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for property located at Broward County, Florida ; Grantees: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Hekkanen, Justin)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report,Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Smith and Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donna L. Cajar. (mee)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alfredo Jose Cajar. (mee)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alfredo Jose Cajar, Donna L. Cajar. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12965017, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Summon(s) Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Lis Pendens)(Hekkanen, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Cajar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Justin Eric Hekkanen
Represented By: Christopher Kirk Walker
Represented By: William Patrick Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Jose Cajar
Represented By: Christopher Kirk Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna L. Cajar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?