Advanced Diabetes Treatment Centers, LLC v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Advanced Diabetes Treatment Centers, LLC
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Case Number: 0:2020cv61175
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Serve Service/Show Cause Response due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/18/2020. (eca)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ebz)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar II. (ebz)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar II, in his capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Health & Human Services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13023882, filed by Advanced Diabetes Treatment Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Hartmann, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Diabetes Treatment Centers, LLC v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Diabetes Treatment Centers, LLC
Represented By: Frank Anthony Florio
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?