Senger v. McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Senger
Defendant: McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61204
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Remanding Case to State Court. The clerk is instructed to CLOSE this case. Any pending motions are denied as MOOT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Remand with Agreed Damages by McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Allaman, Melissa)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. The parties are directed to file a joint scheduling report on or by July 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Scott Wikgren on behalf of Christopher Senger (Wikgren, Brent)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McLaren Automotive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent McLaren Finance plc for McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Allaman, Melissa)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Allaman, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Written Discovery Requests) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13048068, filed by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allaman, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Senger v. McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Fletcher Allaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Senger
Represented By: Brent Scott Wikgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?