BISHOP et al v. BALDWIN et al
Plaintiff: SANDRA BISHOP, DAVID BISHOP and EILEEN BATTEN
Defendant: KATHLEEN HOOK, JEFF JOHNSON, NCB WHOLESALE CO., PRECIOUS COMMODITIES, INC., ROSS BALDWIN, ANDRE CARDOSO, CARRIE JOHNSON and NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61254
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per Order DE#18 . In Limine Motions due by 6/7/2021. (drz)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 9/10/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2020., Discovery due by 5/3/2021., Expert Discovery due by 5/3/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/10/2021., In Limine Motions due by 5/24/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2021., Motions due by 5/24/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/30/2021.), ( Mediation Deadline 5/10/2021.). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by EILEEN BATTEN, DAVID BISHOP, SANDRA BISHOP identifying Other Affiliate Richard N Batten for DAVID BISHOP, EILEEN BATTEN, SANDRA BISHOP (Cohn, Aaron)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by EILEEN BATTEN, DAVID BISHOP, SANDRA BISHOP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Joint Scheduling Order)(Cohn, Aaron)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #5 Amended Complaint, filed by DAVID BISHOP, SANDRA BISHOP, EILEEN BATTEN. NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC. Answer due 9/16/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/11/2020. (AHS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Matthew Leto re #13 Notice of Change of Address. AAttorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew Leto (Leto, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint by NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC.. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leto, Matthew) Modified Relief on 7/30/2020 (ls).
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant, National Coin Brokers, Inc. filed by EILEEN BATTEN, DAVID BISHOP, SANDRA BISHOP. (Cohn, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Leto on behalf of ROSS BALDWIN, NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC.. Attorney Matthew Leto added to party ROSS BALDWIN(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Leto added to party NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC.(pty:dft). (Leto, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROSS BALDWIN. ROSS BALDWIN waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Leto, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/7/2020. (eca)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against ROSS BALDWIN, ANDRE CARDOSO, KATHLEEN HOOK, CARRIE JOHNSON, JEFF JOHNSON, NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC., NCB WHOLESALE CO., PRECIOUS COMMODITIES, INC., filed by EILEEN BATTEN, SANDRA BISHOP, DAVID BISHOP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cohn, Aaron)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDRE CARDOSO. (drz)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROSS BALDWIN, KATHLEEN HOOK, CARRIE JOHNSON, JEFF JOHNSON, NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC., NCB WHOLESALE CO., PRECIOUS COMMODITIES, INC.. (drz)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against ROSS BALDWIN, ANDRE CARDOSO, KATHLEEN HOOK, CARRIE JOHNSON, JEFF JOHNSON, NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC., NCB WHOLESALE CO., PRECIOUS COMMODITIES, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13086842, filed by EILEEN BATTEN, SANDRA BISHOP, DAVID BISHOP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Ross Baldwin - Summons, #3 Summon(s) Jeff Johnson - Summons, #4 Summon(s) Carrie Johnson - Summons, #5 Summon(s) Andre Cardoso - Summons, #6 Summon(s) Kathleen Hook - Summons, #7 Summon(s) National Coin Broker, Inc. - Summons, #8 Summon(s) NCB Wholesale Co. - Summons, #9 Summon(s) Precious Commodities Inc. - Summons)(Cohn, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BISHOP et al v. BALDWIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HOOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB WHOLESALE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECIOUS COMMODITIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS BALDWIN
Represented By: Matthew Leto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE CARDOSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIE JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL COIN BROKER, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Leto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA BISHOP
Represented By: Aaron Michael Cohn
Represented By: Scott Lance Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BISHOP
Represented By: Aaron Michael Cohn
Represented By: Scott Lance Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN BATTEN
Represented By: Aaron Michael Cohn
Represented By: Scott Lance Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?