Villalona v. Myers
Plaintiff: Steven Villalona
Defendant: Warden Myers
Case Number: 0:2020cv61292
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (bb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Louisiana Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00502. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the instant petition for habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/29/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/13/2020. (crt,Williams, L)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Villalona. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2020: #3 Proposed order) (Haik, K).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/27/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/22/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven Villalona. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalona v. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Myers
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Villalona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?