Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Alfieri et al
Plaintiff: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as VPX Sports/REdline/Bang Energy
Defendant: Amy Maros, Andrew LaRocca, Elegance Brands, Inc., Christopher Alfieri and Adam Perry
Case Number: 0:2020cv61307
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER continuing evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Tuesday, September 1, 2020, at 10:00 AM. The hearing will be via Zoom Teleconferencing. Login information, meeting identification, and password will be forwarded to counsel via email. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/27/2020. (eyr)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/27/2020. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 50 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher S Prater, Jonathan Edgar Pollard, Scott Douglas Knapp, Peter Ronai Goldman, Gregg Howard Metzger, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (eyr)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Edgar Pollard on behalf of Christopher Alfieri, Elegance Brands, Inc., Andrew LaRocca, Amy Maros, Adam Perry. Attorney Jonathan Edgar Pollard added to party Christopher Alfieri(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Edgar Pollard added to party Elegance Brands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Edgar Pollard added to party Andrew LaRocca(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Edgar Pollard added to party Amy Maros(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Edgar Pollard added to party Adam Perry(pty:dft). (Pollard, Jonathan)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings per DE 17 Order. Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/1/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Raag Singhal. (kpe)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Expedited per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Christopher Alfieri, Elegance Brands, Inc., Andrew LaRocca, Amy Maros, Adam Perry. Replies due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Composite, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 - Composite, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - Composite)(Prater, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER; granting #12 Motion to Seal. Prelinjhrg Hearing set for 8/27/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Expedited per Local Rule 5.4 by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion) (Goldman, Peter)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elegance Brands, Inc. (Prater, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 10 [respm] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cbr)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 8/17/2020. (Knapp, Scott)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Knapp, Scott)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law via FedEx to Pollard PLLC (Khouri, Stephanie)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Christopher Alfieri, Elegance Brands, Inc., Andrew LaRocca, Amy Maros, Adam Perry. Attorney Christopher S Prater added to party Christopher Alfieri(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Prater added to party Elegance Brands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Prater added to party Andrew LaRocca(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Prater added to party Amy Maros(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Prater added to party Adam Perry(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/10/2020 (Prater, Christopher)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Bukovi)(Khouri, Stephanie)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE filed by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Khouri, Stephanie)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Alfieri, Elegance Brands, Inc., Andrew LaRocca, Amy Maros, Adam Perry. (mee)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13113089, filed by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2-A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2-B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summon(s) For issuance-Alfieri, #10 Summon(s) For issuance-Perry, #11 Summon(s) For issuance-LaRocca, #12 Summon(s) For issuance-Maros, #13 Summon(s) For issuance-Elegance)(Metzger, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Alfieri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Maros
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew LaRocca
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elegance Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Alfieri
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Perry
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg Howard Metzger
Represented By: Stephanie Souraya Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as VPX Sports/REdline/Bang Energy
Represented By: Gregg Howard Metzger
Represented By: Stephanie Souraya Khouri
Represented By: Peter Ronai Goldman
Represented By: Scott Douglas Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?