Trugon Properties, Inc. v. American First Federal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trugon Properties, Inc.
Defendant: American First Federal, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61369
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Alicia O Valle
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by American First Federal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit (Composite) 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hill, Suzanne)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry filed by Trugon Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(German, John)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, Amended Response filed by Trugon Properties, Inc.. Replies due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by Trugon Properties, Inc.. Replies due by 8/31/2020. (Simon, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American First Federal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(Hill, Suzanne)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and an extension of time to reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion to Deposit Funds. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than August 24, 2020. Plaintiff shall reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion to Deposit Funds no later than August 24, 2020.Going forward, all motions and filings by the Parties must comply fully with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, and the Practices and Procedures of this Court. Pursuant to Section II(B) of this Court's Practices and Procedures, "[a]bsent an emergency, requests for extensions of time must be presented to the Court, by motion, no later than 48 hours prior to the deadline from which the Parties are seeking relief. Sanctions may be imposed for non-emergent requests made less than 48 hours prior to the deadline." Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/17/2020. (shy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Trugon Properties, Inc.. (Simon, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian Tiblier on behalf of American First Federal, Inc.. Attorney Christian Tiblier added to party American First Federal, Inc.(pty:dft). (Tiblier, Christian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry filed by American First Federal, Inc.. Replies due by 8/12/2020. (Hill, Suzanne)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by American First Federal, Inc.. Attorney Suzanne Barto Hill added to party American First Federal, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hill, Suzanne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Party Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service Party was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#13]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cqs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed (for image see DE#12) on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Trugon Properties, Inc.. American First Federal, Inc. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (cqs)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Trugon Properties, Inc.. Trugon Properties, Inc. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Summon(s))(Simon, Andrew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non- Dispositive Matters AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. The Court's #9 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Notice of Court Practices and Procedures is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/15/2020. (shy)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Notice of Court Practices and Procedures. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to American First Federal, Inc. (cqs)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to American First Federal, Inc. by Trugon Properties, Inc. re #1 Complaint, filed by Trugon Properties, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Simon, Andrew)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry by Trugon Properties, Inc.. (German, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Cody German on behalf of Trugon Properties, Inc. (German, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Trugon Properties, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Simon, Andrew)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against American First Federal, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13145606, filed by Trugon Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Simon, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trugon Properties, Inc. v. American First Federal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American First Federal, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Tiblier
Represented By: Suzanne Barto Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trugon Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Simon
Represented By: John Cody German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?