Burnham Partners, Inc. v. ACE American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Burnham Partners, Inc.
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company and The Horton Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61374
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas William Travis on behalf of The Horton Group, Inc.. Attorney Nicholas William Travis added to party The Horton Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Travis, Nicholas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by ACE American Insurance Company. (Dickenson, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Burnham Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Susik, Kristen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham Partners, Inc. (Susik, Kristen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Burnham Partners, Inc. (Susik, Kristen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Richard Frain, Other Affiliate Glenn Horton for ACE American Insurance Company (Dickenson, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc. for ACE American Insurance Company (Dickenson, John)
August 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines Per DE#8. Amended Complaint due by 8/17/2020. (cqs)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Burnham Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Brochure, #3 Exhibit Website, #4 Exhibit Website, #5 Exhibit Application, #6 Exhibit Letter)(Susik, Kristen)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Plaintiff must separately re-file its Amended Complaint (DE [7-1]) pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, by August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/12/2020. (eca)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Add Additional Party, MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ( Responses due by 8/25/2020) by Burnham Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Susik, Kristen)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/22/2020. (eca)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darlene M. Lidondici on behalf of Burnham Partners, Inc.. Attorney Darlene M. Lidondici added to party Burnham Partners, Inc.(pty:pla). (Lidondici, Darlene)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by ACE American Insurance Company. (Dickenson, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Declaratory Relief) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13147949, filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) Modified on 7/8/2020 (drz). (No Answer of Affirmative Defenses Filed in State Court)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnham Partners, Inc. v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnham Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Marie Susik
Represented By: Christopher Rogers Fertig
Represented By: Darlene M. Lidondici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: John David Dickenson
Represented By: Chad A. Pasternack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Horton Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas William Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?