Swift IP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Swift IP, LLC and Swift Response, LLC
Defendant: InvenTel Products LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv61447
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Swift IP, LLC, Swift Response, LLC. InvenTel Products LLC served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Sekharan, Preethi)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Swift IP, LLC, Swift Response, LLC. InvenTel Products LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Sekharan, Preethi)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to File Media Exhibits as Exhibits 18-32 of the Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their media exhibits with the Clerk of Court on a USB drive. The Clerk of Court is authorized and instructed to accept the USB drives. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/20/2020. (eyr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION To File Media Exhibits As Exhibits 18-32 Of The Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Swift IP, LLC, Swift Response, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sekharan, Preethi)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall be: double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c).Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Pursuant to Southern District of Florida CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedure 3I(6), all proposed orders must be e-mailed in Word format (.doc or.docx) to the division e-mail address at Singhal@flsd.uscourts.gov.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2020. (eyr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert S. Katz, Heather Smith-Carra, Evi T. Christou, Erik S. Maurer, mailing date July 17, 2020, (pt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to InvenTel Products LLC. (mee)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13197469, filed by Swift IP, LLC, Swift Response, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28)(Sekharan, Preethi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift IP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift IP, LLC
Represented By: Evi T. Christou
Represented By: John William Terwilleger
Represented By: Robert S. Katz
Represented By: Erik S. Maurer
Represented By: Heather Smith-Carra
Represented By: Preethi Sekharan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Response, LLC
Represented By: Evi T. Christou
Represented By: John William Terwilleger
Represented By: Robert S. Katz
Represented By: Erik S. Maurer
Represented By: Heather Smith-Carra
Represented By: Preethi Sekharan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InvenTel Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?