Chambers v. Green Realty Properties, Inc.
Plaintiff: Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.
Defendant: Green Realty Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61450
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Approving Voluntary Dismissal. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr (Heller, Shawn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr (Heller, Shawn)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. Green Realty Properties, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Heller, Shawn)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Green Realty Properties, Inc.. (jbs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Realty Properties, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13198594, filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Heller, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Green Realty Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn Alex Heller
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Realty Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?