ABS Healthcare Services, LLC et al v. Maxim Health Inc.
Plaintiff: ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC and HEALTH OPTION ONE, LLC
Defendant: MAXIM HEALTH INC., and Maxim Health Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61456
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery filed by Maxim Health Inc.. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Ruling, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - TRO California Action)(Gale, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Maxim Health Inc. (Lewis, Samuel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxim Health Inc. (Lewis, Samuel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by ABS Healthcare Services, LLC, Health Option One, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
September 11, 2020 Filing 23 Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions For Discovery Only. Filed by ABS Healthcare Services, LLC, Health Option One, LLC (McCawley, Sigrid)
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Abraham Lewis on behalf of Maxim Health Inc.. Attorney Samuel Abraham Lewis added to party Maxim Health Inc.(pty:dft). (Lewis, Samuel)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER ON #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery (the "Motion"). Defendant must respond to the Motion by September 14, 2020. The Motion is tentatively set for hearing on September 21, 2020 at 2:00 pm. Because a ruling on the Motion may affect #15 Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion to Dismiss"), the deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended. Accordingly, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Plaintiffs' response to the Motion to Dismiss is due within 14 days from the undersigned's ruling on the instant Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 9/8/2020. (sd01)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING #18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery filed by Health Option One, LLC, ABS Healthcare Services, LLC. Motion referred to Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by ABS Healthcare Services, LLC, Health Option One, LLC re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery) (McCawley, Sigrid)
September 6, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery by ABS Healthcare Services, LLC, Health Option One, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2020 (McCawley, Sigrid)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall comply with the Court's Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties, and Corporate Disclosure Statement [DE 9] no later than September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/2/2020. (lbn)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report and Related Deadlines re #9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by ABS Healthcare Services, LLC, Health Option One, LLC. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint or in the alternative Transfer or Stay by Maxim Health Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - California TRO, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Tierney Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - California Motion to Dismiss)(Horowitz, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #11 Maxim Health Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Maxim Health Inc. shall respond to the Complaint no later than September 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/18/2020. (lbn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time 30 days re #1 Complaint. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Anthony Gale on behalf of Maxim Health Inc.. Attorney James Anthony Gale added to party Maxim Health Inc.(pty:dft). (Gale, James)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Maxim Health Inc.. Attorney Matthew Neil Horowitz added to party Maxim Health Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Horowitz, Matthew) Modified Relief on 8/11/2020 (ls).
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABS Healthcare Services, LLC, Health Option One, LLC (McCawley, Sigrid)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, HEALTH OPTION ONE, LLC. All Plaintiffs. (McCawley, Sigrid)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking #5 Summons Returned Executed, filed by ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, HEALTH OPTION ONE, LLC by ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC (McCawley, Sigrid)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Summons Returned Executed,. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, HEALTH OPTION ONE, LLC. MAXIM HEALTH INC., served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (McCawley, Sigrid)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that attorney James Fox Miller has not been added to this case re #1 Complaint. For further information, please contact Attorney Admissions at 305-523-5265. (cco)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAXIM HEALTH INC. (scn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAXIM HEALTH INC.,. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13200982, filed by ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, HEALTH OPTION ONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(McCawley, Sigrid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABS Healthcare Services, LLC et al v. Maxim Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIM HEALTH INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Health Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Abraham Lewis
Represented By: James Anthony Gale
Represented By: Matthew Neil Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABS HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Sigrid Stone McCawley
Represented By: Carlos Mario Sires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH OPTION ONE, LLC
Represented By: Sigrid Stone McCawley
Represented By: Carlos Mario Sires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?