MCPHEE v. NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC
Plaintiff: EBONY MCPHEE
Defendant: NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv61457
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by EBONY MCPHEE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumstein, Jake)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC (Perre, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. However, the Court notes the parties filed this motion on the day the joint scheduling report was due. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle 'pending the Court's disposition of the motion,' parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020). The Court does not anticipate granting additional motions for extension of time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/8/2020. (eyr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties by NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perre, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jake Slome Blumstein on behalf of EBONY MCPHEE (Blumstein, Jake)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by EBONY MCPHEE (Richards, Jordan)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (eyr)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall be: double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c).Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Pursuant to Southern District of Florida CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedure 3I(6), all proposed orders must be e-mailed in Word format (.doc or.docx) to the division e-mail address at Singhal@flsd.uscourts.gov.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/18/2020. (eyr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC. Attorney Christopher Taylor Perre added to party NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC(pty:dft). (Perre, Christopher)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by EBONY MCPHEE. NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Richards, Jordan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jake Slome Blumstein on behalf of EBONY MCPHEE (Blumstein, Jake)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC. (mee)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13202914, filed by EBONY MCPHEE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) as to Nations Client Resolution, LLC)(Richards, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCPHEE v. NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBONY MCPHEE
Represented By: Melissa Jane Scott
Represented By: Jake Slome Blumstein
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONS CLIENT RESOLUTION, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Taylor Perre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?