G&S Marble, Inc. v. Office of the US Trustee et al
Appellant: G&S Marble, Inc.
Appellee: Linda Marie Leali and Office of the US Trustee
Case Number: 0:2020cv61560
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure by Appellant(s) to Timely File Designation or Statement of Issues, Closing Case. Signed by US Bankruptcy Judge Peter D. Russin on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (jc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill Ellen Kelso on behalf of Office of the US Trustee. Attorney Jill Ellen Kelso added to party Office of the US Trustee(pty:e). (Kelso, Jill)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua) Modified text on 8/3/2020 (jua).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by G&S Marble, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 20-16711-PGH, filed by G&S Marble, Inc..(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&S Marble, Inc. v. Office of the US Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: G&S Marble, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Thomas Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Linda Marie Leali
Represented By: Linda Marie Leali
Represented By: Adisley Cortez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Represented By: Linda Marie Leali
Represented By: Adisley Cortez Rodriguez
Represented By: Jill Ellen Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?