South Broward Hospital District v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District d/b/a Memorial Healthcare System and South Broward Hospital District doing business as Memorial Healthcare System
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. and Health Options, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61656
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Reply due by 10/21/2020.PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court. Reply due by 10/19/2020. Replies due by 10/19/2020. Replies due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/5/2020. (eca)
October 5, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court , #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Demand for Jury Trial by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Uhlemann, Justin)
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Cravatta, Katlin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Demand for Jury Trial filed by South Broward Hospital District. Replies due by 10/5/2020. (Pincavage, Danya)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by South Broward Hospital District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Order Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(Ali-Shamaa, Omar)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Diversified Health Services, Inc. for Health Options, Inc.; Corporate Parent GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. (Uhlemann, Justin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by South Broward Hospital District (Ali-Shamaa, Omar)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by South Broward Hospital District. (Ali-Shamaa, Omar)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal filed by South Broward Hospital District. (Ali-Shamaa, Omar)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. Replies due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Uhlemann, Justin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Demand for Jury Trial ( Responses due by 9/17/2020), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Demand for Jury Trial by South Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Sheridan v. United Order, #3 Exhibit REVA v. United Order)(Ali-Shamaa, Omar)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Omar Mazien Ali-Shamaa on behalf of South Broward Hospital District (Ali-Shamaa, Omar)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc. (Uhlemann, Justin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Demand for Jury Trial by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Uhlemann, Justin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendants' response is due no later than August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/25/2020. (lbn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. Responses due by 9/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Uhlemann, Justin) Modified Relief on 8/21/2020 (ls).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Health Options, Inc. (Uhlemann, Justin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. (Uhlemann, Justin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-13362885, payment transferred from : 20-cv-61654 South Broward Hospital District v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., et al., filed by Health Options, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. No Answer filed/No Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Uhlemann, Justin) Text Modified on 8/18/2020 (scn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Broward Hospital District v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Brian Uhlemann
Represented By: Katlin Charles Cravatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Options, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Brian Uhlemann
Represented By: Katlin Charles Cravatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District d/b/a Memorial Healthcare System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District doing business as Memorial Healthcare System
Represented By: Douglas Wolfe
Represented By: Danya Pincavage
Represented By: Omar Mazien Ali-Shamaa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?