CHINCHILLA AGUILAR v. Europa USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AQUILINO CHINCHILLA AGUILAR
Defendant: Antonio Cupelli and Europa USA, Inc. doing business as Caffe Eurpoa
Case Number: 0:2020cv61661
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by AQUILINO CHINCHILLA AGUILAR (Pollock, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. On or before November 16, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon Defendant Antonio Cupelli or show good cause as to why this Complaint should not be dismissed as to Defendant Antonio Cupelli for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by November 16, 2020 will result in a dismissal of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Antonio Cupelli without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AQUILINO CHINCHILLA AGUILAR. Europa USA, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Europa USA, Inc.)(Pollock, Brian)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Antonio Cupelli, Europa USA, Inc.. (amb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13370269, filed by AQUILINO CHINCHILLA AGUILAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) EUROPA, #3 Summon(s) CUPELLI)(Pollock, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHINCHILLA AGUILAR v. Europa USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AQUILINO CHINCHILLA AGUILAR
Represented By: Brian Howard Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Cupelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Europa USA, Inc. doing business as Caffe Eurpoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?