J.H., a minor, v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: J.H., and Jonathon Hall
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv61667
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vernon Christopher Marsh on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Vernon Christopher Marsh added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Marsh, Vernon)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jonathon Hall, filed by J.H.,.(Dearing, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. Attorney John Carl Seipp, Jr added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Seipp, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by J.H.,. J.H., served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Affidavit)(Dearing, David)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Benjamin E. Baker, Jr. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/1/2020. (ogn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (cbr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13441474 by J.H.,. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Dearing, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) directed to Ford Motor Company by J.H., re #1 Complaint, filed by J.H., (Dearing, David)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report,Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13374382, filed by J.H., a minor, by and through Anita Hall, as Mother and Next Friend. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dearing, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.H., a minor, v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H.,
Represented By: David Patrick Dearing
Represented By: Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Represented By: Vernon Christopher Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?