Joseph v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Shibu Joseph
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 0:2020cv61675
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Defendant by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Fischler, Jeremy)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Fischler, Jeremy)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Notice (Other). Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (pes)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Fischler, Jeremy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (yha)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II (yha)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - SHIBU JOSEPH and SUSAMMA JOSEPH v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13376367, filed by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Fischler, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shibu Joseph
Represented By: Joanna M Alemany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeremy Brett Fischler
Represented By: William Jacob Peterfriend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?