Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co Inc v. VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Plaintiff: Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc a Florida corporation doing business as VPX Sports
Case Number: 0:2020cv61677
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER re #19 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 10/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (osd)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION,AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 8/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020., Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Expert Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Fact Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/13/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/11/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/15/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2021., Motions due by 5/18/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/11/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for all discovery matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Giovinco, Stephen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc (Giovinco, Stephen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc (Giovinco, Stephen)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Richard F.X. Guay, AND #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Marc Sabow. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/24/2020. (co)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Marc Sabow. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13569531 by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc. Responses due by 10/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Giovinco, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard F.X. Guay. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-13569316 by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc. Responses due by 10/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Giovinco, Stephen)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL,granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Eric Andrew Gordon representing Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc (Plaintiff); Attorney Melissa Segarra Zinkil representing Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eric A. Gordon and Melissa S. Zinkil for / by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc. Responses due by 10/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff)(Gordon, Eric)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report,Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Joseph Giovinco on behalf of Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc. Attorney Stephen Joseph Giovinco added to party Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc(pty:pla). (Giovinco, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Foster, Zachary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc (Foster, Zachary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc (Foster, Zachary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc (pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Marc Sabow, Richard Guay, mailing date 08/20/2020, (cco)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., a Florida corporation, d/b/a VPX. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377273, filed by Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc., a New York Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Distributor Agreement, #4 Exhibit B - Spirits response, #5 Exhibit C - Termination Without Cause Notice, #6 Exhibit D - Retraction Notice, #7 Exhibit E - Spirits May 4, 2020 cure-demand letter, #8 Exhibit F - failure-to-cure notice)(Gordon, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co Inc v. VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit & Sanzone Distributors Co., Inc
Represented By: Eric Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Melissa Segarra Zinkil
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Giovinco
Represented By: Richard Guay
Represented By: Marc Sabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc a Florida corporation doing business as VPX Sports
Represented By: Zachary Scott Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?